Accounts and annual returns ELMONADILLA SUDANESE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1125197
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 April 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 June 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required