ENFIELD BOROUGH OVER 50S FORUM

Charity number: 1122859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £77.73k £75.17k £82.47k £87.52k £71.41k
Total expenditure £92.16k £85.95k £85.46k £86.49k £59.45k
Income from government contracts £9.00k £0 £9.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A