ENFIELD BOROUGH OVER 50S FORUM

Charity number: 1122859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yvonne Mona Mulder Trustee 27 May 2014 None on record
Christopher Chinnery Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
Walter Bowry Trustee 30 May 2017
ENFIELD VOLUNTARY ACTION Received: On time
TALAT SHAIKH Trustee 29 May 2016
MUSLIM COMMUNITY & EDUCATION CENTRE (MCEC) Received: On time
JOHN M BALL Trustee 10 June 2011 None on record
Niki Lemonides Trustee 29 June 2021 None on record
VICTORIA PITE Trustee 29 June 2021 None on record
MR TONY WATTS MSC Trustee None on record
John Geoffrey Cantle Trustee 27 May 2014 None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee None on record
MR CHAMPAK MISTRY Trustee None on record
Roger Biss Trustee 29 June 2021 None on record
VIVIEN GILADI Trustee 10 June 2011 None on record
Dr George Rufai Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
JAN OLIVER Chair 29 June 2021 None on record