Financial history AFRICAN REFUGEE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1120861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £39.59k £52.08k £59.99k £138.03k £77.91k
Total expenditure £37.29k £50.97k £57.85k £117.01k £70.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A