Governing document SEVEN LOCKS HOUSING LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE INDUSTRY BUSINESS OR TRADE OF:- 1) PROVIDING SOCIAL HOUSING, HOMES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDING FOR ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF HOMES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 5) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 6) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LEICESTERSHIRE, HARBOROUGH DISTRICT, DERBYSHIRE DALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.