ETERNAL LIGHT MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1126715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £37.86k £36.83k £35.71k £37.47k £34.12k
Total expenditure £27.99k £28.32k £28.23k £28.98k £28.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A