Financial history SAINT JOHN SOUTHWORTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £135.69k £143.90k £132.32k £101.82k £100.99k
Total expenditure £70.00k £111.79k £147.95k £16.02k £95.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A