BRINGING HOPE

Charity number: 1122288
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £115.69k £93.89k £157.80k £150.33k £239.50k
Total expenditure £130.25k £105.60k £155.28k £128.08k £202.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £6.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.00k N/A N/A £105.21k