Financial history JESUS REIGNS MINISTRIES - UK

Charity number: 1121400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £153.95k £166.99k £182.60k £388.23k £273.72k
Total expenditure £142.18k £152.39k £155.23k £183.79k £151.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A