THE OPERA TRUST

Charity number: 1124026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 September 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 January 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required