AMPIAH KWOFI WORLD OUTREACH

Charity number: 1121415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.66k £1.62k £3.25k £3.55k £1.55k
Total expenditure £2.02k £300 £5.25k £4.43k £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A