Trustees BRADFORD PEOPLE FIRST
Charity number: 1122294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUREKHA THIND | Chair | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jack Allinson | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Barrett | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mehtab Ahmed | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maaryaah Samina Khan | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Owen Allsopp | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Wrigglesworth | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Obaid Malik | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WARDLE | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.