HELPING ALLEVIATE POVERTY IN SOUTH INDIA

Charity number: 1122876
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £12.00k £21.38k £8.28k £23.78k £32.27k
Total expenditure £20.38k £17.46k £14.64k £27.30k £21.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A