MUSIC FOR PEOPLE (SUMMER SCHOOL OF MUSIC)

Charity number: 1122957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £70.12k £87.88k £111.59k £97.93k £95.51k
Total expenditure £67.89k £79.14k £106.65k £93.91k £98.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A