ROCK OF JOY TRUST

Charity number: 1121659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £138.96k £117.80k £139.68k £89.06k £181.74k
Total expenditure £157.00k £131.94k £127.11k £101.77k £153.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A