Financial history THE SAINSBURY VETERANS WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 1125046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £62.86k £40.32k £33.00k £32.55k £4.53k
Total expenditure £51.47k £28.08k £26.19k £19.14k £9.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A