REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - WINNERS SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1123771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £66.37k £72.92k £128.48k £101.71k £65.17k
Total expenditure £63.78k £60.14k £95.29k £78.20k £66.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A