GILOH LIMITED

Charity number: 1121830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.91k £10.18k £21.89k £13.84k £69.28k
Total expenditure £6.00k £5.81k £19.95k £15.36k £14.40k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A