THE PRAYER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £165.25k £168.64k £185.28k £162.77k £125.77k
Total expenditure £174.24k £151.70k £152.87k £126.54k £92.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A