THANDA UK

Charity number: 1126225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £34.83k £83.54k £15.30k £16.75k £31.08k
Total expenditure £26.48k £82.67k £7.81k £8.30k £19.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A