Financial history FLORA & ROBERT LIVSEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1122389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £13.57k £14.42k £510 £1.39k £1.31k
Total expenditure £8.53k £66.13k £506.79k £78.71k £986
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A