Trustees THE NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK BROADS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1124552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KEITH BACON | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr NICHOLAS MARK COLLINS | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Martyn Hooton | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Nigel John Brennan | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hayden | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Nigel Best | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Bruce Hanson | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON EGAN | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DUNFORD | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CATOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.