STARS CHILDREN'S BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1122625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anita Pisani Trustee 08 July 2020 None on record
Timothy Edward Saunders Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
Julia Curtis Trustee 26 August 2020 None on record
Helen de Spretter Trustee 26 May 2021 None on record
Syreeta McKay Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
DAVID CULLEY Chair None on record
Rebecca Wood Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record
PHILIP ISAAC Trustee 20 April 2012 None on record