Financial history TOW LAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1122539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £76.31k £64.17k £71.57k £71.42k £60.19k
Total expenditure £91.81k £75.14k £91.07k £66.92k £83.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £33.38k £55.53k £22.18k £27.41k