NGBOTIMA CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1123165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.62k £3.74k £4.41k £9.77k £9.64k
Total expenditure £6.65k £8.87k £9.96k £15.33k £16.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A