Governing document Applied Microbiology International
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 AUG 2019 as amended on 16 Jul 2020 as amended on 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE SCIENCE OF MICROBIOLOGY, IN ITS APPLICATION TO THE ENVIRONMENT, HUMAN AND ANIMAL HEALTH, AGRICULTURE AND INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
INTERNATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.