Financial history ST MILDREDS PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.44k £10.03k £7.99k £6.35k £231
Total expenditure £6.78k £4.57k £9.19k £7.75k £7.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A