THE CHEDER LIMITED

Charity number: 1123628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £39.81k £41.26k £40.30k £39.38k £45.80k
Total expenditure £17.96k £16.56k £15.48k £14.71k £13.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A