Trustees KENT ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS
Charity number: 1123362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Philip George Mawby | Chair | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Richardson | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbi Claire Louise Caliandro | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ann Cross | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bramwell Field | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charissa Amie Baldock | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.