CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.00k £9.89k £10.00k £22.00k £23.50k
Total expenditure £9.98k £9.00k £9.89k £21.00k £22.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A