Financial history NORTHERN EXPOSURE RESCUE

Charity number: 1125518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.06k £22.16k £30.26k £39.07k £2.84k
Total expenditure £24.75k £22.30k £29.97k £32.98k £8.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A