Financial history SHELFORD GOSPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1123608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £54.41k £335.76k £36.23k £38.82k £498.98k
Total expenditure £14.34k £9.69k £4.39k £4.03k £8.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A