Governing document National Police Aid Charity
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 2008 AND 14 DECEMBER 2010. as amended on 08 Nov 2019 as amended on 11 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
The aim of the charity is for the public benefit by advancing the basic human rights of health care and education in the developing world, primarily in rural, particularly impoverished communities. To achieve its aim the charity transports donated goods for relief and assistance to our link partners, providing, for example, hospital beds, mobility aids, maternal provisions, school furniture and text books. The donated goods are sought by us from individuals, institutions, corporations and companies. Recipients, who have very few resources, have additional, relevant goods by which to enhance health care and education. Volunteers, who are central to our activities, benefit by having purposeful occupation and responsibility. The wider community benefits through engagement with our activities, such as work experience, and through our emphasis on recycling with minimum waste.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.