Financial history ST MARY'S PRITTLEWELL BELLS FUND

Charity number: 1123755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £1.49k £1.38k £954 £470 £0
Total expenditure £60 £1.00k £60 £60 £69
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A