Financial history SARBAT DA BHALA

Charity number: 1124825
Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.41k £837 £457 £306 £140
Total expenditure £200 £240 £240 £250 £240
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A