Financial history INSTITUTE FOR DAYANIM

Charity number: 1123833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £52.43k £41.52k £54.71k £52.69k £47.28k
Total expenditure £52.20k £40.60k £59.66k £50.15k £40.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A