Trustees ASCB CHARITABLE FUND
Charity number: 1123854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSS HENZELL NOOTT | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WILLIAM TAYLOR MBE | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MATTHEW SENIOR CBE | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RAYSON | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH COX | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVIES OBE | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA KIMBER | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CHRISTOPHER ALLISON | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARLEY ATHOL ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.