MARKET COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1124421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.42k £6.35k £2.99k £1.84k £21.77k
Total expenditure £8.61k £6.40k £1.02k £3.62k £14.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A