Trustees DISABILITY INFORMATION BUREAU

Charity number: 1124371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynette Ann Walker Trustee 16 January 2024
CONGLETON BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Mary Passmore Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Ruth Brocklehurst Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record
Alison Herdson Trustee 17 January 2023
None on record
MICHELLE SIMPSON Trustee 21 September 2021
BODY POSITIVE CHESHIRE AND NORTH WALES
Received: On time
Philip Andrew Richards Trustee 26 January 2021
THE ROSSENDALE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
MS COMMUNITY ACTION & SUPPORT
Recently registered
Gill Peate Trustee 20 January 2015
None on record