YOUTH EDUCATION SPORT

Charity number: 1125267
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.13k £34.62k £32.11k £36.67k £34.53k
Total expenditure £26.49k £37.23k £28.99k £37.97k £35.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A