Trustees ACADEMY OF MEDICAL EDUCATORS
Charity number: 1128988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Robert Fisher | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colin Francis Macdougall | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Xiu | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Conlan | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Louise Jones | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harish Kumar Thampy | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Michael Price | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Russell Peek | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa-Jayne Ann Edwards | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohamed Elhassan Abdalla Elsayed | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Fairley Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Helen Anne Stevenson | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ratna Makker | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Joanne Stocker | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Annette Allery | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Baker | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Aidan Byrne | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Adele Dubras | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alan Denison | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Michael Read | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Nicolas Cooper | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julie Browne | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW GRANT | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.