Financial history THE AFGHAN CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1125910
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £38.75k £2.38k £507 £0 £0
Total expenditure £44.43k £585 £2.27k £2.31k £2.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A