THE ELDER TREE LIMITED (VOLUNTARY VISITING SERVICE)

Charity number: 1124248
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £429.57k £438.05k £466.94k £530.33k £667.94k
Total expenditure £409.17k £412.35k £442.84k £471.01k £639.15k
Income from government contracts £325.00k £325.00k £325.00k £323.65k £443.77k
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A £8.47k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £9.07k £14.47k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £520.74k £652.79k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £522 £681
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £439.84k £603.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £31.17k £35.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £20.30k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0