Trustees CHESHIRE REFORM CONGREGATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1124560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Laura Jane Rachel Cohen | Chair | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francine Mitchell | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kathleen Swerling | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cohen | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle-Renee Breeze | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Rabin | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Kletz | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Esme Thomas | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Leno Balsamo | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry Robert Fox | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Schindel Knowles | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Angel | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.