DAIMLER GREEN COMMUNITY RECREATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1125079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.43k £8.61k £7.40k £19.65k £25.87k
Total expenditure £13.78k £6.80k £10.33k £20.62k £13.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A