THE VALAN EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1125064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 December 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required