EXETER ROYAL ACADEMY FOR DEAF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1124523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £7.21m £5.53m £4.70m £4.80m £5.36m
Total expenditure £6.93m £7.08m £5.62m £5.29m £4.90m
Income from government contracts £6.09m £4.76m £4.33m £3.09m £4.02m
Income from government grants £49.19k £47.74k £53.52k £68.08k £107.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.88k £33.47k £173.12k £15.22k £907.93k
Income - Other trading activities £92.40k £68.96k £37.97k £43.29k £36.26k
Income - Charitable activities £7.01m £5.31m £4.45m £4.74m £4.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £53.27k £32.38k £21.63k £34.35k £8.61k
Income - Other £37.99k £89.66k £21.68k £10.67k £258.48k
Income - Legacies £10.88k £0 £3.24k £659 £803
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.70m £6.91m £5.43m £5.12m £4.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £169.10k £147.76k £187.77k £167.67k £189.67k
Expenditure - Governance £17.02k £0 £22.99k £11.48k £26.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £64.61k £18.81k £0 £115 £0