THE STEAM TUG KERNE PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1126323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.19k £21.94k £23.65k £15.75k £27.64k
Total expenditure £55.08k £20.89k £23.57k £26.54k £34.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A