FRIENDS OF PENWORTHAM SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124911
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £24.51k £22.53k £24.61k £20.19k £10.15k
Total expenditure £11.99k £10.60k £21.53k £20.32k £10.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A