Financial history ALISTAIR ROBERTS MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1127010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.45k £12.67k £12.66k £19.74k £8.23k
Total expenditure £5.92k £9.94k £8.49k £1.77k £378
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A